judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOLMES (KEVIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35367
Short Caption:HOLMES (KEVIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 41065 , 59713 , 60569 , 65490 , 68484 , 68484-COA , 68955 , 69766 , 70728 , 73913 , 73913-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C129708Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/05/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/27/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings.
12/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant). 99-13176
01/12/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 00-00504
02/02/2000Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. 10/11/99 and 10/12/99 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 00-01675
02/17/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 10/11/99 and 10/12/99. Court Reporter: Shirlee Prawalsky. 00-02531
04/27/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 24, 2000. 00-06880
05/25/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-08793
05/26/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant shall have to and including June 23, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 00-08906
06/26/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third request) 00-10940
07/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file the opening brief and appendix received on July 10, 2000. 00-11704
07/10/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. 00-11689
07/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-11690
08/10/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express -No postmark. 00-13887
09/12/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: October 8, 2000. 00-16032
10/09/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-17814
02/09/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. To Clark County Clerk, Re: Transmission of Exhibit.
03/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NNP01A-MS/RR/DA 01-03979
03/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/21/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-08384
06/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 7, 2001, appellant Kevin Holmes submitted a "motion for rehearing". Appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person. We direct the clerk of this court to return to appellant, unfiled, the motion for rehearing. The remittitur is due to issue on June 18, 2001. We order issuance of the remittitur stayed to provide appellant's counsel an opportunity to file a petition for rehearing on appellant's behalf within 15 days from the date of this order. If appellant's counsel does not file a petition for rehearing within 15 days of the date of this order, the remittitur shall issue 20 days from the date of this order. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel and shall address concerns relating to this appeal to his counsel of record. 01-09975
06/14/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Kevin Holmes. Returned unfiled, the original proper person Motion for Rehearing received June 7, 2001.
07/12/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On June 20, 2001, appellant filed a proper person document entitled, 'Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record.' No good cause appearing, we deny that motion. fn1[although we have not granted appellant permission to file documents in proper person, we direct the clerk of this court to file the proper person document received on June 20, 2001, as we have considered that document on the merits.] Because counsel has not filed a petition for rehearing within the time specified in NRAP 40 or in this court's June 14, 2001, order, we direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur forthwith. 01-11844
07/12/2001MotionFiled Proper Person Motion. Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney of Record. 01-10452
07/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: Plaintiff's Exhibit 89 (photograph) this day. 01-08514
07/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 18, 2001. 01-08514
10/15/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Denied. A petition for a writ of certiorari was filed August 13, 2001 and placed on the docket October 4, 2001 as Case No. 01-6644. 01-17403
12/10/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice from U.S. Supreme Court\Certiorari Granted. The petition for a writ of ceritorari is denied. (No action required.) 01-20659