judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RICARDO D. CASH V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1678
Short Caption:RICARDO D. CASH V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Sexual Abuse
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:12/09/1982

Opening Event Date:12/09/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/15/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/16/1984
Argued/Submitted:05/22/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRicardo D. Cash N
Matthew C. LeeferNY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
John R. Fisher YN
Mary Ellen Abrecht YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CASH, RICARDO D. UNITED STATES
12/09/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/15/1983FiledRecord Completed
02/16/1984FiledBriefing Completed
05/22/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/01/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition