judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00452-CV
04-81-00452-CV
12/03/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Pruett, Scott
Van Dalsem, Curtis H.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
11/29/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/16/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/15/1983Brief Filed
03/08/1983Order Entered
03/08/1983Submission
03/08/1983Submission
03/08/1983Submitted
07/16/1982Requests Oral Argument
07/15/1982Requests Oral Argument
07/06/1982Brief Filed
07/06/1982Case ready to be set
06/10/1982Brief Filed
05/20/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/14/1982No Description Available.
05/13/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
05/12/1982Response to Motion Filed
05/07/1982No Description Available.
04/19/1982No Description Available.
03/30/1982No Description Available.Motion Granted in Part
03/11/1982Response to Motion Filed
03/03/1982No Description Available.
01/18/1982Argument Letter Sent
01/14/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1981No Description Available.
12/03/1981No Description Available.
12/03/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/25/1981Appeal Bond Filed
08/28/1981Judgment Signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/06/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
293rd Judicial District Court
Maverick
Honorable George Thurmond
5407