judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Dolenz, M.D., Bernard J. v. All Saints Episcopal Hospital

Case: 02-81-00044-CV
02-81-00044-CV
12/01/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Dolenz, M.D., Bernard J.
All Saints Episcopal Hospital
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/09/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
12/31/1982Writ DisposedRefused
10/13/1982Writ Filed
09/09/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/13/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
48th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Clifford Davis
48-44953-77