judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00807-CR
14-81-00807-CR
12/04/1981
Rape and Aggravated Rape
Killings, Alvin Lewis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/12/1983Mandate Issued
10/13/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/18/1983Submission
03/28/1983Case ready to be set
02/28/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
01/28/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
01/20/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/24/1982Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/22/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
09/02/1982No description available.GRANTED
12/04/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/12/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
183rd District Court
Harris
336,925
55 years