judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00063-CV
09-81-00063-CV
12/01/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Aetna Casualty and Surety Company
Silas, Crawford L.
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/03/1982Mandate Issued
06/23/1982Writ DisposedRefused
04/29/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/28/1982Writ Filed
04/01/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/25/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
03/11/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/18/1982Submitted
01/28/1982Brief Filed
01/15/1982Brief Filed
01/06/1982Supplemental Transcript filed
01/02/1982No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
12/18/1981Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/01/1981Submission
12/01/1981No Description Available.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/03/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
E110,582