judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CARLINE ADELLE LEW v. FRANK W. LEW

Case Heading (S-19-0036)
Case Number:S-19-0036Case Docketed On:02/22/2019
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:CARLINE ADELLE LEW v. FRANK W. LEW
Full Title:CARLINE ADELLE LEW, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. FRANK W. LEW, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCarline Adelle LewMichael William Stulken
AppelleeFrank W. LewElizabeth Greenwood
Inga L. Parsons

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Marriage and Divorce, Other
Opinion Number:2019 WY 99
Citation:449 P.3d 683

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/22/2019Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/22/2019Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/22/2019Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/22/2019Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/05/2019Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/09/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/20/2019Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/24/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/30/2019Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/31/2019Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/03/2019Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/03/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/11/2019Order - Assigning to brief only docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/20/2019Event - Phone Call regarding status of record. D.C. clerk working on this one next.EventPhone CallFinal
06/21/2019Event - Phone Calls with Greenwood Law regarding citations to the record in their brief of appellee. They will be filing a motion to file a corrected brief.EventPhone CallFinal
06/21/2019Motion - Correct a DocumentMotionCorrect a DocumentFinal
06/27/2019Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, two volumes. Volume 1, Original Papers; Volume 2, Statement of the Evidence.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/02/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's Motion for Permission to File a Corrected BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2019Order Granting Motion to File Corrected BriefOrderGrantFinal
07/11/2019Brief - Appellee (Corrected)BriefAppelleeFinal
07/19/2019Event - Phone Call to counsel regarding status of hard copies of brief, lvm with Lannie.EventPhone CallFinal
07/29/2019Event - Hardcopy received - Corrected Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/27/2019Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing and remanding in part with Justice Gray writing for the courtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/15/2019Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/15/2019Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/15/2019Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/15/2019Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/21/2019Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/17/19 by Hollie BramwellServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal