judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCLEMORE (MARK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33974
Short Caption:MCLEMORE (MARK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32369
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C82059Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/31/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/31/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-02371
04/23/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99A-CY/MS/ML 99-03214
05/19/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-04075
05/19/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/04/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 27, 1999. 99-04075