judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD SETEREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-199)
Case Number:06-199Case Docketed On:08/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:RICHARD SETEREN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD SETEREN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard SeterenD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 144
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/16/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
10/17/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/30/2006Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/01/2006Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/16/2007Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
02/14/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
04/02/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of designation of record and brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/04/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/20/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/24/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; volume II, transripts; volume III, confidential documents.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/24/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
09/17/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/03/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/03/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/08/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal