judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SIRACUSA, RICHARD

Case Information: 80-SP-0923
Short Caption:SIRACUSA, RICHARDClassification:Appeals - Special Proceedings - Other Special Proceedings
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:SP740-80Filed Date:07/15/1980

Opening Event Date:07/15/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/10/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/07/1982
Argued/Submitted:03/10/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SIRACUSA, RICHARD IN THE MATTER OF:
07/15/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/10/1981FiledRecord Completed
01/07/1982FiledBriefing Completed
03/10/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/16/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition