Case Heading (S-19-0002) | |||||
Case Number: | S-19-0002 | Case Docketed On: | 01/04/2019 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2) | ||
Short Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: GEORGE W. STANFORD, a/k/a GEORGE WILLIAM STANFORD, deceased ANDREW J. JOHNSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | IN THE MATTER OF THE ESTATE OF: GEORGE W. STANFORD, a/k/a GEORGE WILLIAM STANFORD, deceased. ANDREW J. JOHNSON, Appellant (Petitioner), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Respondent). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Andrew J Johnson | Thomas N. Long Aaron John Lyttle Robert P. Schuster Bradley L. Booke |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Bridget L. Hill Michael James McGrady Daniel E. White |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Civil Procedure, Estates - Probate, Limitation of Actions |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 94 |
Citation: | 448 P.3d 861 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/04/2019 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/04/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/04/2019 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
01/04/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
02/13/2019 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
02/13/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/14/2019 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
03/07/2019 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
03/12/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/22/2019 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
04/23/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/23/2019 | Motion - Extension of time - Reply brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
04/23/2019 | Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File (Reply) Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
04/23/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/14/2019 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
05/21/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Dan White o/b/o Appellee | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
06/07/2019 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
06/10/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/10/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of Appellant | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/10/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Robert P. Schuster obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
06/18/2019 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Fox, Kautz, Boomgaarden and Gray (Thomas N. Long, Aaron J. Lyttle, Robert P. Schuster, argument by Mr. Schuster o/b/o Appellant; Daniel E. White o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
06/18/2019 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes 1 thru 2 - Original papers; Volume 3 - Transcript | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
06/18/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
06/21/2019 | Notice-Incoming - Additional authority | Notice-Incoming | Additional authority | Final | |
06/21/2019 | Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Additional Authority | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
09/11/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order reversing with Chief Justice Davis writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
09/27/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
09/27/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
09/27/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
09/27/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |