Case Information: 33956 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: ESTATE OF FRIEDMAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - P40822 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Leavitt | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/06/1999 / Levitt, Lansford | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 01/03/2000 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/26/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Theodore J Manos & Associates--check no. 18078. | ||
03/26/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-02224 | |
03/26/1999 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
04/06/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
05/05/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Petition to Remove Appeal from Mandatory Settlement Conference Program. | 99-03620 | |
06/08/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct Attorney George J. Claseman to inform this court of the names of any parties he represents in this appeal. We direct attorney for appellant, Teodore J. Manos, to inform this court whether he has any knowledge of any person who may be a respondent or other interested party in this appeal. Mr. Claseman and Mr. Manos shall proved this information to this court in writing within 30 days of this order. | 99-04814 | |
06/21/1999 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Affidavit of Theodore J. Manos, Esq. | 99-05390 | |
06/28/1999 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 99-05662 | |
07/06/1999 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order. The docketing statement provisionally submitted on June 21, 1999, shall be filed, forthwith. | 99-05861 | |
07/06/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-05862 | |
07/06/1999 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Affidavit of George J. Claseman, Esq. | 99-05937 | |
09/01/1999 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. This is an appeal from an order of the district court denying admission of the will of Margaret M. Friedman, deceased, to probate. On May 5, 1999, settlement judge Lansford W. Levitt filed a report concluding that a meaningful settlement conference cannot be held in this matter. Attorney Claseman filed an affidavit in response to our June 8, 1999 order, on July 6, 1999. Our review of the district court's docket entries and minutes reveals that none of the Kutsches were ever listed as parties to the action below and that attorney Claseman did not enter a formal appearance as their counsel. It further appears that Velma and Larry Kutsch have no interest in participating in this appeal. We direct the clerk to modify the caption on this court's docket. We also direct the clerk to remove the name of George Claseman as counsel of record in this matter. We vacate this matter from the settlement conference program. Appellant Frank P. Silver shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript request and 120 days to file the opening brief and appendix. Upon the filing of the opening brief and appendix, this matter shall stand submitted for decision based upon the opening brief, appendix and record before this court. | 99-08211 | |
09/17/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 99-08824 | |
01/03/2000 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 12/30/99. | 00-00061 | |
01/03/2000 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. | 00-00062 | |
01/03/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/21/2000 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Reversed and remanded." Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. Rose, C.J., Young, J., Maupin, J., Shearing, J., Agosti, J., Becker. J. fn5-[The Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice, voluntarily recused himself from participation in the decision of this appeal.] 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 81. En Banc | 00-14597 | |
09/18/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 00-14762 | |
09/18/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/25/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. | 00-14762 |