judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01270-CR
05-81-01270-CR
12/04/1981
Manslaughter
Harvey Lee Holifield
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/24/2017Order enteredDestroy
12/13/2016Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
04/17/1986Mandate Issued
04/04/1986Case Returned from Higher Ct.
04/02/1986Mandate IssuedDismissed
03/13/1986Opinion issuedDismissed
04/08/1983Case Forwarded to Higher CourtMotion or Writ Granted
03/08/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
02/18/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
02/04/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/10/1982Submitted
03/31/1982Brief Filed
03/01/1982Brief Filed
01/04/1982Agreed Record pursuant to TRAP Rule 34.2
12/07/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/24/2017Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Ed Kinkeade
F77-9959-LM
20 yrs tdc & $10000 Fine