judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

TURNER (VINCENT) VS. STATE

Case Information: 33967
Short Caption:TURNER (VINCENT) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 33551 , 36743 , 40615 , 45009 , 54737 , 55092 , 56954 , 73520
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109922Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/29/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in lower court proceedings. NOTE: See 6/4/99 docket entry--Justice Maupin no longer disqualified.
03/29/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Sat in lower court proceedings. NOTE: See 6/21/99 docket entry--Justice Leavitt no longer disqualified.
03/29/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-02294
04/01/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. December 7,8,9,10, and 14, 1998 Proceedings: To Court Reporter: Tina Smith. 99-02417
04/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-02814
06/04/1999Notice/Outgoing Notice of Justice Disqualification. Upon further review it has been determined that Justice Maupin will not be disqualified from participation in this matter.
06/21/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-05355
06/21/1999Notice/Outgoing Notice of Justice Disqualification. Upon further review it has been determined that Justice Leavitt will not be disqualified from participation in this matter.
07/19/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Acknowledgement. Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 99-06431
07/21/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Sixty day enlargement of time. 99-06553
07/23/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The motion filed June 21, 1999, requesting an extension of time to prepare the transcripts is granted. The clerk shall forthwith file the transcripts receivedon July 19, 1999. The motion filed on July 21, 1999, is granted. Appellant's opening brief and appendix shall be filed and served on or before September 27, 1999. 99-06644
07/23/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Vols. 1 through 9 (12/7/98 through 12/14/98). Court Reporter: Tina B. Smith. 99-06430
09/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Sixty day enlargement of time. 99-09193
09/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall have to and including November 29, 1999 to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. No further extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 99-09340
11/30/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for a Twenty-One day Enlargement of Time to File Opening Brief. 99-11924
12/08/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Brief and appendix due: December 20, 1999. No futher extensions of time shall be permitted in the absence of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 99-12273
12/23/1999BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 12/20/99. 99-13091
12/23/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-13092
12/28/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 99-13277
01/25/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 1/24/00. 00-01208
02/25/2000MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion for Leave to File a Supplement to His Opening Brief. 00-03014
03/09/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to Extend Time to File a Supplement to His Opening Brief. 00-03706
03/10/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Appellant shall file and serve a supplemental opening brief and appendix within 20 days from the date of this order. Respondent shall file and serve a supplemental answering brief within 20 days from the date of service of appellant's supplemental opening brief. There shall be no reply brief submitted on this issue. 00-03807
03/10/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Appellant's Supplemental Brief. 00-03708
03/10/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appellant's Supplemental Appendix. 00-03709
03/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. The supplemental brief and appendix were filed on March 10, 2000. We deny as moot appellant's March 9, 2000, motion for an extension of time to file a supplement to the opening brief. 00-04764
04/12/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in Filing State's Response to Appellant's Supplemental Brief. 00-05843
04/13/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Respondent's supplemental answering brief provisionally submitted on April 11, 2000, shall be filed, forthwith. 00-05915
04/13/2000BriefFiled Supplemental Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief. 00-05777
08/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[Pursuant to NRAP 34(f)(1), we have concluded that oral argument is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14008
08/29/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15145
08/30/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Appellant shall have to and including September 12, 2000, to file and serve a petition for rehearing. 00-15231
09/19/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On August 30, 2000, this court entered an order granting appellant an extension of time until September 12, 2000, to file a petition for rehearing. To date, appellant has failed to file a petition for rehearing. We direct the clerk of this court to issue the remittitur in this matter, forthwith. 00-16544
09/19/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16550
09/19/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-16550