judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01262-CR
05-81-01262-CR
12/04/1981
Driving While Intoxicated
Glenn Edward Peace
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
03/03/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/30/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2016Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
12/15/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
08/25/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
07/22/1983Letter issued by the court
07/11/1983Letter issued by the court
07/11/1983Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/21/1983Motion for rehearing filed
06/10/1983Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/03/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/10/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/13/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/12/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/27/1982Motion for extension of time to file record disposed
08/30/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/26/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
08/19/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/10/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
04/22/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/23/1982Reporters record filed
03/23/1982Clerks record filed
02/02/1982Motion for extension of time to file record filed
12/04/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/10/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Peace, Glenn EdwardCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 10
Dallas
Honorable Dallas County Judge, County Criminal Court No. 10
81-2553-L
1 year