judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01265-CR
05-81-01265-CR
12/04/1981
Aggravated Rape
James Clark Bryant
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
04/12/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
03/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/16/2016Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/20/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/16/1982Letter issued by the court
04/12/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
03/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
03/16/1982Clerks record filed
03/16/1982Reporters record filed
12/04/1981Docketing statement filed
12/04/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/20/1982Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Bryant, James ClarkCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
265th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 265th District Court
F79-2640-PR
5 years