Case Information
50086RLNR | The People of the State of California vs. NATHANIEL RADIMAK
Case Number
50086RLNR
Court
Barstow Traffic
File Date
12/09/2014
Case Type
Infraction
Case Status
AR Fine
Party
Plaintiff
The People of the State of California
Defendant
RADIMAK, NATHANIEL W
DOB
XX/XX/XXXX
Charge
RADIMAK, NATHANIEL W
Disposition Events
04/24/2015
Judicial Officer
Allen, Larry W
04/24/2015
Judicial Officer
Allen, Larry W
04/24/2015
Judicial Officer
Allen, Larry W
Events and Hearings
-
12/09/2014 New Filed Case
-
03/23/2015 Notice Of Trial In Absentia Mailed To Defendant.
-
04/15/2015 Conversion event
-
04/15/2015 Decision And Notice Of Decision Form Printed
-
04/24/2015 Trial in Absentia
-
04/24/2015 Legacy Minutes
-
05/07/2015 Decision And Notice Of Decision In Trial In Absentia Mailed