judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BRYANT, RICKY D. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1360
Short Caption:BRYANT, RICKY D. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Lead:82-CF-1360Consolidated: 82-CF-1370
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F591-80Filed Date:10/04/1982

Opening Event Date:10/04/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/31/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:08/28/1984
Argued/Submitted:10/07/1985
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
A. Franklin Burgess NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Randolph N. Stone YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel S. Seikaly YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BRYANT, RICKY D. UNITED STATES
01/01/1906 BURGESSA (TAB) FARRELLM (TAB)
10/04/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/31/1984FiledRecord Completed
08/28/1984FiledBriefing Completed
10/07/1985FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
11/15/1985FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition