Case: 94-1026
94-1026
10/12/1994
App Writ of Error
MANUEL LONGORIA ROBERT TART JR. and JERRY PITTMAN
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO and THE FIREFIGHTERS' and POLICE OFFICERS' CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION and TYRONE POWERS (INTERVENOR)
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/10/1994 | Reply to Response | Respondent | Behalf of City of San Antonio and the Fire Fighters and Police Officers Civil Service Commission | |
10/17/1994 | Reply to Response | Intervenor | Behalf of Tyrone Powers | |
10/12/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/10/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
04/26/1995 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | No Mo/Re filed | | |
03/23/1995 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | | |
11/10/1994 | Reply to Response | Behalf of City of San Antonio and the Fire Fighters and Police Officers Civil Service Commission | | |
11/02/1994 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/17/1994 | Reply to Response | Behalf of Tyrone Powers | | |
10/12/1994 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/26/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored. | No Mo/Re filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CITY OF SAN ANTONIO | Respondent | Mr. Lloyd Garza |
PITTMAN, JERRY | Petitioner | Mr. James M. Parker Ms. Paula Dlugosz |
TART, JR., ROBERT | Petitioner | Mr. James M. Parker |
LONGORIA, MANUEL | Petitioner | Mr. Harry A. Nass Jr. |
FIRE FIGHTERS AND POLICE OFFIC | Respondent | Ms. Paula Dlugosz |
POWERS, TYRONE | Intervenor | Mr. Mayo J. Galindo |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-93-00417-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 07-27-94
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable SHIRLEY W. BUTTS
Trial Court Information
45th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ron Carr
93-CI-03826