Case: 10-81-00194-CR
10-81-00194-CR
12/04/1981
Driving While Intoxicated
Guillermo E. Delgado
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
10/09/2007 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
07/14/1982 | Case stored | | |
07/14/1982 | Mandate issued by this Court | | |
05/13/1982 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/06/1982 | Submitted | | |
12/04/1981 | Notice of Appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/09/2007 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
66th District Court
Hill
26,672
3 Years