judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-81-00362-CR
02-81-00362-CR
12/03/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Gonzales, Salvador
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/21/1984Writ of CertiorariMotion or Writ Denied
01/06/1984Stay Issuance of Mandate
01/01/1984Writ of Certiorari
10/28/1983Stay Issuance of Mandate
10/05/1983Order EnteredRefused
05/20/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
05/19/1983Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
04/20/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
04/06/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Tarrant
26477-R
99 yrs TDC