judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PETERSON (LARRY) VS. STATE

Case Information: 35345
Short Caption:PETERSON (LARRY) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C85897Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/15/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/23/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-13100
02/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 35260, 35266, 35322, 35338, 35345, 35346, 35347. 00-01925
05/15/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 05/11/00. 00-08017
05/15/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/08/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn7[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-13407
09/05/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-13523
09/05/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 14, 2001. 01-13523