Case Heading (S-16-0067) | |||||
Case Number: | S-16-0067 | Case Docketed On: | 03/09/2016 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Civil Rights Sec. 1983 | ||
Short Title: | DANIEL LEE HARRIS v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director of Department of Corrections | ||||
Full Title: | DANIEL LEE HARRIS, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. ROBERT O. LAMPERT, Director of Department of Corrections, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Daniel L. Harris | Pro Se |
Appellee | Robert O. Lampert | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/09/2016 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/09/2016 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/09/2016 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
03/09/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/21/2016 | Brief - Appellant - (Entitled Motion for Appeal) | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
03/22/2016 | Order Dismissing Appeal | Order | Dismiss - jurisdiction | Final | |
04/07/2016 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/12/2016 | Notice-Outgoing - Unfiled pleadings returned. Petition for Reinstatement received April 11, 2016 returned as case was closed April 7, 2016. | Notice-Outgoing | Unfiled pleadings returned | Final | |
05/09/2016 | Correspondence - Incoming requesting refund of docket fee; advised non-refundable | Correspondence | Incoming | Final |