Case: 01-98-01271-CV
01-98-01271-CV
11/20/1998
Juvenile
Lipton, Arthur S.
Shea & Gould
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/11/1999 | Cause number voided--see remarks on history screen | Void this Court's case number | |
03/11/1999 | Cause number voided--see remarks on history screen | Void this Court's case number | |
03/10/1999 | 37.3 Notice record is past due | | |
03/10/1999 | Reporter's Record Past Due Notice sent | | |
11/28/1998 | Record due | | |
11/20/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
11/12/1998 | NOA received in COA from trial court. | | |
11/12/1998 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
09/29/1998 | Date judgment signed by trial judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/11/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
SHEA & GOULD | Appellee | Jon D Totz Marc L. Ellison |
REPORTER, COURT | Court reporter | Jacquelyn Miles |
COUNTY CLERK | County clerk | Hon. Beverly B. Kaufman |
Lipton, Arthur S. | Appellant | Arthur S. Lipton |
JUDGE, TRIAL | Trial court judge | Hon. Lynn Bradshaw-Hull |
Trial Court Information
Co Civil Ct at Law No 3
Harris
Honorable PATRICIA RAE LYKOS
621001