judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PEOPLE'S COUNSEL OF D.C. V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION

Case Information: 79-AA-1037
Short Caption:PEOPLE'S COUNSEL OF D.C. V. PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSIONClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission
Lead:79-AA-1037Consolidated: 79-AA-1073
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/16/1979

Opening Event Date:10/16/1979Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/07/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/18/1981
Argued/Submitted:04/09/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/11/1988

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-PetitionerPotomac Electric Power CompanyN
Zoe A. Bush NN
Intervenor-RespondentPotomac Electric Power CompanyN
William D. Shapiro NN
PetitionerPeople's Counsel of the District of ColumbiaN
Frederick D. Dorsey YN
RespondentD.C. Public Service CommissionN
Howard C. Davenport NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PEOPLE'S COUNSEL OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION
01/01/1903NOTE - 01 1/16/80 ORD: ON WED 1/30/80 AT NOTE - 01 9:30 A.M. CONSIDERATION OF THE NOTE - 02 OTHER MOTIONS ARE PENDING NOTE - 02 AWAITING DECISION ON MOTION NOTE - 03 TO DISMISS NOTE - 03 NOTE - 04 1/30/80 ORD: SHALL FURNISH THE NOTE - 04 CLERK A COPY OF THE PSC'S PROP NOTE - 05 ORDER #6096, ETC., ALL AS NOTE - 05 DISCUSSED BY PARTIES W/RESPECT NOTE - 06 TO PEPCO'S MOT. TO DISMISS IN NOTE - 06 79-1037 & AT ORAL ARGUMENT ON NOTE - 07 SAID MOTION NOTE - 07 NOTE - 08 11/7/80 ORD: MOTION TO CONVENE NOTE - 08 SETTLEMENT CONF DENIED; FURTH NOTE - 09 ORD THAT BRIEF OF PEOPLE'S NOTE - 09 COUNSEL IN 79-1037 SHALL BE NOTE - 10 FILED ON OR BEF 11/28/80 AND NOTE - 10 APLE'S CONSLDTD BRIEF SHALL BE NOTE - 11 FILED W/IN 30 DAYS THEREAFTER NOTE - 11 NOTE - 12 11/30/82 OPINION: NOT NOTE - 12 INCONSISTENT WITH OPINION NOTE - 13 11/25/86 ORD:FROM DATE OF ORD; NOTE - 13 APLE & INTVNR'S WITHIN 30 DAYS NOTE - 14 AFTER PETITIONER'S BRIEF NOTE - 14
10/16/1979FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/16/1979MEMORANDUM PET. OF APPEAL OF A DECISION OF THE PSC BOARD PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
10/19/1979CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD & TO MELVIN WASHINGTON PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1980ORDER SCHDING INTVNR MOT. TO DISMISS PET. OF APPEAL FOR ORAL ARGU. (SEE NOTE FIELD 1 THRU 3) PANELNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/30/1980ORDER DIRECTG, SS, THAT COUNSEL FOR THE PARTIES, W/IN 5 DAYS, (SEE NOTE FIELD 4 THRU 7) PANELKYKNFE SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/03/1980ORDER DENYG INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION OF APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/07/1980FiledRecord Completed
11/07/1980ORDER CONSLDTNG 79-1037 & 79-1073 FOR ALL PURP;FURTH ORD THAT (SEE NOTE FIELD 8 THRU 11) PANELNW SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/28/1980PETITIONER'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/13/1981INTERVENOR'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/18/1981FiledBriefing Completed
02/18/1981RESPONDENT'S BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/04/1981PETITIONER'S REPLY BRIEF PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
04/09/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/09/1981ARGUED PANELNBMKPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/30/1982AFFIRMED IN PART/REMANDED IN PART JMT AFFIRMING IN PART ORDER ON REVIEW...REMANDING FOR PROCEED ING (SEE NOTE FIELD 12 PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
12/22/1982MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/14/1986RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
11/25/1986ORDER PARTIES MAY FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS: APLT'S WITHIN 40 DAYS (SEE NOTE FIELD 13 - 14) PANELPY SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
01/16/1987PTNR MOTION FOR LV TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMOTO 2/27/87 PB TTC PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
02/27/1987PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF/MEMORANDUM JB PANEL SCDATE 022787 SCHPRD SMA
01/28/1988ORDER SS, SCHED CASE ON REG CAL AS SPECIAL SITTING ON 3/18/88 AT 10:00. DAS PANELPY SCDATE 012188 SCHPRD VS
03/11/1988INTERVENOR'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL (PEPCO) (NO OPPO) PB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD
03/14/1988FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
03/14/1988ORDER GRANT MO. OF PEPCO TO WITHDRAW APPEAL AND DISMISSING THIS APPEAL SL PANELPY SCDATE 031888 SCHPRD CREG
03/14/1988DISP NO - 01 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
03/14/1988DISP NO - 02 DISP - DS METH -ORD JUDGE -PY CITE
04/11/1988MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD