judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HEATHER MARIE CURETON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0001)
Case Number:S-07-0001Case Docketed On:01/02/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:HEATHER MARIE CURETON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:HEATHER MARIE CURETON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHeather Marie CuretonDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Other
Opinion Number:2007 WY 168
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/02/2007Event - Docketed and indexed.EventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court.Notice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter.Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/15/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/21/2007Order - Grant - extension of time.OrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/04/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/06/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/18/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of designation of record on appeal and brief on disk.BriefAppellantFinal
06/01/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
06/08/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/21/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/21/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/21/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/24/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/09/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/09/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/09/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/15/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 11/14/07 by Candice Ford.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal