judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ABRAHAM (SAMUEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34600
Short Caption:ABRAHAM (SAMUEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 53770
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C110294Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:MaupinCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/03/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/02/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Maupin. Sat in district court proceedings.
08/02/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/02/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07068
10/07/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34600, 34624, 34634, 34650, 34651, 34659, 34662. 99-09659
01/03/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 5. Mailed on 12/29/99. 00-00013
01/03/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/29/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Having conducted a preliminary review of the record, we conclude that our review of additional documents is warranted. The clerk of the district court shall have 30 days from the date of this order to transmit to the clerk of this court, as a supplemental record on appeal, a certified copy of the transcript of the proceedings in district court on each of the following dates: November 29, 1993; January 12, 1994; and January 26, 1994. In the event the necessary transcripts have not yet been prepared and filed in the district court, the district court shall have 10 days from the date of this order to order the prompt preparation of the transcripts and shall deliver a copy of the district court's order to this court within 15 days. Upon completion of the transcripts, the clerk of the district court shall have 10 days to transmit to this court a certified copy of each of the transcripts as a suupplemental record on appeal. 01-05458
05/29/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Deputy Clerk Barbara Belt regarding the status of the filing of transcripts. 01-08868
07/27/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on July 23, 2001. 01-12774
07/30/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Volume 6. Certified copies of the transcripts of January 12, 1994 and January 26, 1994. Letter from Deputy Clerk Barbara Belt: another transcript ordered by your court is not included, as of this date the transcript of November 29, 1993 has not been filed. 01-12818
08/07/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Affidavit. Affidavit of court reporter Patsy K. Smith. 01-13306
01/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On March 29, 2001, we entered an order that directed court reporter Patsy K. Smith to prepare and file a transcript for proceedings conducted on November 29, 1993. On August 7, 2001, Ms. Smith filed an affidavit with this court explaining that she was not the court reporter for the November 29, 1993, proceedings. Further review of the district court record indicates that Connie Miller was the court reporter present at the November 29, 1993, proceedings. Accordingly, we vacate that portion of our March 29, 2001, order directing Ms. Smith to prepare and file the transcript of proceedings conducted on November 29, 1993. Ms. Miller shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcript for proceedings conducted on November 29, 1993. If more time is needed to complete the preparation of the transcript, Ms. Miller shall, within the same time period, file a motion with this court requesting an extension of time and stating the reason for the extension. If the requested transcript cannot be produced, Ms. Miller shall notify this court, in writing, of this fact. 02-01506
01/31/2002Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Constance Miller regarding transcripts of November 29, 1993. 02-02092
03/29/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn9[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-05625
04/23/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-05745
04/23/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/29/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2002. 02-05745