judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COMBS (FRANKLIN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34660
Short Caption:COMBS (FRANKLIN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C118559Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/12/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/12/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07465
09/15/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Order filed 9/2/99. Due Date: 10 days
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Order Denying Motion to Correct an Illegal Sentence and Request for Evidentiary Hearing appealed from filed in district court on: Septemer 2, 1999. 99-09188
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34633, 34660, 34722, 34836, 34848, 34871, 34910. 99-11136
02/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 02/11/00. 00-02314
02/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/17/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." Nos. 34659/34660 (cases are not consolidated). 01-08222
06/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-08610
06/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/05/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 19, 2001. 01-08610