Case Information: 81-AA-1309 | |||
Short Caption: | PEOPLE'S COUNSEL PSC | Classification: | Agency - Administrative Agency - Public Service Commission |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | Filed Date: | 11/05/1981 | |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 11/05/1981 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 08/27/1982 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/04/1982 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 11/05/1982 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | PEOPLE'S COUNSEL PSC | |||
11/05/1981 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
08/27/1982 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/04/1982 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
11/05/1982 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
03/28/1984 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |