judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-641
A-641
07/09/1945
Application for Writ of Error
AMERICAN MUTUAL LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
B. F. PARKER, ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/05/1946Response to Brief filedRespondent
12/24/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/17/1945Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
07/19/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
07/09/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
01/09/1946Response to Motion filed
01/05/1946Response to Brief filed
01/04/1946Motion to Argue filed
01/02/1946Response to Motion filed
12/24/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/03/1945Document received (See Remarks)
09/17/1945Brief on the Merits
07/19/1945Response to Petition
07/09/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/09/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
B. F. Parker, et ux.Respondent
American Mutual Liability Insurance CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information