judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

STANLEY, PATRICK UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-0437
Short Caption:STANLEY, PATRICK UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Lead: 82-CF-0154 Consolidated:82-CF-0437
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2100-81Filed Date:03/29/1982

Opening Event Date:03/29/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/26/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/15/1983
Argued/Submitted:10/24/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
William T. MorrisonYY
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary Ellen Abrecht YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901STANLEY, PATRICK UNITED STATES
03/29/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
01/26/1983FiledRecord Completed
07/15/1983FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/28/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition