Case: 97-0669
97-0669
07/24/1997
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
PRUDENTIAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY THE PRUDENTIAL LLOYDS and CONSOLIDATED LLOYDS INSURANCE COMPANY
THE HONORABLE FRANK MALONEY JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/13/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
07/24/1997 | Brief in Support of Petition | Relator | w/petition | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/13/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/12/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
09/11/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
05/22/1998 | Case Stored | | | |
12/11/1997 | Miscellaneous motion disposed. See Remarks. | Filing granted | Agreed motion to dismiss with prejudice is granted | |
12/11/1997 | Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposed | Dismissed | with prejudice | |
12/11/1997 | Stay Order lifted | Stay order issued by this Court 07/25/97 is lifted | | |
11/21/1997 | Motion to dismiss application for writ of error | "Agreed motion to dismiss with prejudice" | | |
11/04/1997 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | called atty S. Saindor requesting status of settlement | | |
11/03/1997 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Called Atty S. Saindor requesting status of settlement | | |
08/05/1997 | Call received | from counsel for real parties; case has settled; will file a motion to dismiss once settlement documents have been executed | | |
08/05/1997 | Letter Filed | by fax from Steven R. Saindon RE: settlement "O" + 2 | | |
07/25/1997 | Motion for temporary relief disposed | Filing granted | | |
07/25/1997 | Request made for reply to proceeding | by Friday, August 8, 1997 | | |
07/25/1997 | Stay Order issued | staying ALL proceedings | | |
07/24/1997 | Motion for temporary relief | w/motion for leave | | |
07/24/1997 | Brief in Support of Petition | w/petition | | |
07/24/1997 | Exhibits received | 1 volume (Orig & 11 copies) | | |
07/24/1997 | Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus | | | |
07/24/1997 | Petition for writ received | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/22/1998 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 15-C-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CONSOLIDATED LLOYDS INSURANCE | Relator | Mr. Richard W. Hunnicutt III |
MALONEY, FRANK | Judge | The Honorable Frank J. Maloney |
PRUDENTIAL PROPERTY & CASUALTY | Relator | Mr. Richard W. Hunnicutt III |
THE PRUDENTIAL LLOYDS | Relator | Mr. Donald L. Crook Jr. |
RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL | Respondent | Mr. Steven R. Saindon |
RODRIGUEZ, OLIVIA | Respondent | Mr. Steven R. Saindon |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-97-00484-CV
M/L/F denied
ORDER, 07-07-97
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable TOM RICKHOFF
Trial Court Information
224th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Frances Maloney
96-CI-12905