judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

W. L. DIAMOND v. EUGENE DUNCAN

Case: 2324
2324
06/21/1911
Application for Writ of Error
W. L. DIAMOND
EUGENE DUNCAN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/11/1915Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/21/1911Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/26/1915Dissenting opinion issued.
06/26/1915Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
02/13/1915Response to Motion filed
02/12/1915Document filed (see remarks)
02/11/1915Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/04/1915Stipulation Filed (see Remarks)
01/27/1915Opinion issued
10/11/1911Document received (See Remarks)
06/21/1911Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/21/1911Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Eugene DuncanRespondent
W. L. DiamondPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information