judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BROOKS, HAROLD M. PFB

Case Information: 81-AA-1308
Short Caption:BROOKS, HAROLD M. PFBClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:11/05/1981

Opening Event Date:11/05/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/17/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/07/1982
Argued/Submitted:10/12/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BROOKS, HAROLD M. PFB ET AL
11/05/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/17/1981FiledRecord Completed
06/07/1982FiledBriefing Completed
10/12/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/13/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition