judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-666
A-666
08/08/1945
Application for Writ of Error
L. R. WHITSON
FLORA ROBERTS GHRISKEY AND HUSBAND, H. W. GHRISKEY, T. P. ROBERTS, L. H. MORRISON, J. W. CROWDUS REALTY COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/20/1946Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/08/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/20/1946Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/18/1945Motion to dismiss
08/14/1945Motion to Strike filedOverruled
08/11/1945Motion to Strike filedOverruled
08/08/1945Response to Motion filed
08/08/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
08/08/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
T. P. Roberts, L. H. Morrison, J. W. Crowdus Realty Company, et al.Respondent
Flora Roberts Ghriskey and husband, H. W. GhriskeyRespondent
L. R. WhitsonPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information