judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-664
A-664
08/07/1945
Application for Writ of Error
MYLA BAKER
EARL M. BAKER
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/15/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/11/1945Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/30/1945Response to PetitionRespondent
08/07/1945Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/24/1945Response to Motion filed
11/15/1945Motion for Rehearing
09/11/1945Reply to Response
09/11/1945Additional Copies received
08/30/1945Response to Petition
08/07/1945Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/07/1945Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Myla BakerPetitioner
Earl M. BakerRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information