Case Information: 30847 | |||
Short Caption: | WILLIS (WALTER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR962395 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/12/1999 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/07/1997 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
08/07/1997 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | ||
08/19/1997 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: May 12, 1997. Court Reporter: Eric V. Nelson. | ||
09/05/1997 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | ||
09/05/1997 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols. 1 through 4. | ||
09/26/1997 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | ||
11/05/1997 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn1[If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. | ||
12/15/1997 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: January 12, 1998. | ||
01/14/1998 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | ||
01/20/1998 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed January 14/, 1998. The opening brief shall be and served and filed on or before February 11, 1998. | ||
02/17/1998 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | ||
02/18/1998 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed filed February 17, 1998. The opening brief shall be served and filed on or before February 25, 1998. | ||
02/27/1998 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | ||
03/02/1998 | Brief | Received Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/27/98. | ||
03/05/1998 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed February 27, 1998. The opening brief provisionally submitted on March 2, 1998, shall fe filed forthwith. | ||
03/05/1998 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | ||
04/02/1998 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 6, 1998. | ||
04/28/1998 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 04/27/98. | ||
05/27/1998 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. Mailed on: 05/26/98. | ||
08/11/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for October 12, 1999 at the hour of 10:30 a.m. - 1/2 hour in Carson City. (NNP-CY, DA, ML) | ||
09/27/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | ||
10/12/1999 | Other | Other. Oral Argument before the Northern Nevada Panel: submitted. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | ||
10/12/1999 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
01/25/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML | ||
02/23/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | ||
03/08/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Entering Receipt for Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 28, 2000. |