Case Information: 84-CV-0355 | |||
Short Caption: | HABIB, NATHAN THURSTON, MARIE | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Landlord And Tenant |
Lead: | 84-CV-0355 | Consolidated: | 84-CV-0636 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | LT77391-83 | Filed Date: | 03/27/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 03/27/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/07/1984 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 11/21/1984 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Amicus-Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Amicus-Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Amicus-Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N | |||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | HABIB, NATHAN THURSTON, MARIE | |||
03/27/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
09/07/1984 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
11/21/1984 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
10/30/1986 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |