judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-1662
B-1662
07/17/1969
Application for Writ of Error
MARRIN F. POER, MARIE POER CHAMBERS, JOINED BY HER HUSBAND ROGER CHAMBERS, ET AL.
DEAN WEBB
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/02/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
08/21/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/08/1969Response to Motion filed
12/04/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/02/1969Reply to Response
08/21/1969Response to Petition
07/17/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/17/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marrin F. Poer, Marie Poer Chambers, Joined by her husband Roger Chambers, et al.Petitioner
Dean WebbRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information