judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

INGE, EDWARD L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-0600
Short Caption:INGE, EDWARD L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Lead: 82-CM-0599 Consolidated:82-CM-0600, 82-CM-0601
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:04/29/1982

Opening Event Date:04/29/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/01/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/28/1983
Argued/Submitted:01/26/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Wallace H. Kleindienst YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901INGE, EDWARD L. UNITED STATES
04/29/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/01/1983FiledRecord Completed
10/28/1983FiledBriefing Completed
01/26/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/23/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition