Case Heading (S-18-0091) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0091 | Case Docketed On: | 04/05/2018 | ||
Linked To: | S-18-0092 , S-18-0093 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Fifth Judicial District Washakie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Trusts (Title 4) | ||
Short Title: | IN RE: THE ROBERT AND IRENE REDLAND FAMILY TRUST, dated August 10, 1989, and the MARITAL TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SURVIVOR OF ROBERT REDLAND AND IRENE REDLAND, ROLLY REDLAND, individually and as Trustee v. ROBERT REDLAND, individually and as former Trustee, and LISA KIMSEY, as Trustee and individually. | ||||
Full Title: | IN RE: THE ROBERT AND IRENE REDLAND FAMILY TRUST, dated August 10, 1989, and the MARITAL TRUST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SURVIVOR OF ROBERT REDLAND AND IRENE REDLAND, ROLLY REDLAND, individually and as Trustee, Appellant (Defendant) v. ROBERT REDLAND, individually and as former Trustee, and LISA KIMSEY, as Trustee and individually, Appellees (Plaintiffs). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Rolly Redland | Steve C.M. Aron Stephen Joseph Darrah |
Appellee | Robert Redland | Greg Weisz Scott W. Meier |
Appellee | Lisa Kimsey | Greg Weisz Scott W. Meier |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Estates - Trusts |
Opinion Number: | 2019 WY 17 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/05/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/05/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/05/2018 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
04/05/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
04/09/2018 | Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Record | Court Reporter's certificate of completion | Final | |
04/09/2018 | Motion - Consolidate (Appellants are different on all three cases. Appellees are same on 18-91 and 18-92 but different on 18-93). | Motion | Consolidate | Final | |
04/18/2018 | Event - Phone Call to Mr. Aron's office re: hard copies of his motion for consolidation (due 4/12). Ericka said they were already sent but would send another set today. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
04/20/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Consolidation as Joint Appeals | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/25/2018 | Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Kautz | Notice-Internal | Recusal memo | Final | |
04/30/2018 | Order Consolidating Appeals (for oral argument and decision) | Order | Consolidating cases | Final | |
05/18/2018 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel (Michael S. Messenger obo Lisa Kimsey and Robert Redland) | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
05/21/2018 | Brief - Appellants' | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
05/21/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/21/2018 | Order Allowing Withdrawal of Counsel (Michael S. Messenger allowed to withdraw as counsel for Robert Redland and Lisa Kimsey) | Order | Granting withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
05/22/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Joint Brief of Appellants; and received copy of Joint Designation of Record by Appellant/Defendants | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/24/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Other (case caption amended to remove Robert Redland from case number S-18-0093 only) | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
07/05/2018 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
07/06/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response Brief of Appellee Lisa Kimsey | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/20/2018 | Brief - Appellant reply | Brief | Appellant reply | Final | |
07/23/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants' Joint Reply Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
07/26/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/08/2018 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, nine volumes (Volumes 1-5 - Original Papers; Volume 6 - 5 Transcripts; Volumes 7-9 - Exhibits) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/08/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
08/10/2018 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
08/20/2018 | Order - Assignment of judge/justice - Retired Justice William U. Hill assigned to act in this matter for Justice Kautz who is recused | Order | Assignment of judge/justice | Final | |
08/24/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from C.M. Aron obo Rolly Redland, Roalene Redland McCarthy, Teresa Redland Shelton, and Kendrick Redland | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
08/27/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Scott W. Meier obo Robert Redland and Lisa Kimsey | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
09/11/2018 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Davis, Justices Burke, Fox, Boomgaarden and Justice (Ret.) Hill (Steve C.M. Aron o/b/o Rolly Redland, Kendrick Redland, Roalene Redland-McCarthy & Teresa Shelton; Scott W. Meir o/b/o Robert Redland and Lisa Kimsey) and taken under advisement. | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
10/09/2018 | Notice of Reassignment Following Retirement (Justice Burke) | Order | Other | Final | |
02/08/2019 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming with Justice Boomgaarden writing for the Court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
02/26/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
02/26/2019 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
02/26/2019 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
02/26/2019 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
03/04/2019 | Service - Certified mail signature return cards (5). Five boxes of the record signed for (undated) by Suzann Whitlock | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |