Case: PD-0296-99
PD-0296-99
03/08/1999
PDR Case Type
CORTEZ, JOSE ACOSTA
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/24/1999 | RESPONSE FILED | State | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/21/1999 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
05/05/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
05/05/1999 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
03/24/1999 | RESPONSE FILED | | |
03/08/1999 | PDR FILED | | |
03/08/1999 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/27/1999 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CORTEZ, JOSE ACOSTA | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Greg Westfall |
STATE OF TEXAS | State | Tim Curry |
Court of Appeals Information:
02-97-00416-CR
AFF 9-24-98
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court 4
Tarrant
Honorable Joe Drago III
0651309R