Case Information: 37047 | |||
Short Caption: | HERRMANN (SHAWN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR001602 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/21/2000 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
11/21/2000 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 00-20459 | |
12/04/2000 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 9/7/00 and 10/10/00. Court Reporter: D. Vieira Filed in district court on: 11/29/00. | 00-21089 | |
12/21/2000 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: September 7, 2000; October 10, 2000. Court Reporter: Debbie Vieira. | 00-22231 | |
12/26/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal. | 00-22397 | |
01/29/2001 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Appellant consents to a voluntary dismissal of this appeal. The motion is granted and we "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP00A-1-CY/RR/NB | 01-01832 | |
01/29/2001 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |