judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PETTUS, KENNETH L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CM-0418
Short Caption:PETTUS, KENNETH L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:M10731-81Filed Date:03/05/1982

Opening Event Date:03/05/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/22/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:06/08/1983
Argued/Submitted:09/20/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Michael R. MurpheyYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Natalia M. Combs-Greene YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PETTUS, KENNETH L. UNITED STATES
03/05/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/22/1982FiledRecord Completed
06/08/1983FiledBriefing Completed
09/20/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
09/30/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition