judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MIGUEL ALBERTO MARTINEZ, a/k/a MICHELLE MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-18-0080)
Case Number:S-18-0080Case Docketed On:03/23/2018
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:MIGUEL ALBERTO MARTINEZ, a/k/a MICHELLE MARTINEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MIGUEL ALBERTO MARTINEZ, a/k/a MICHELLE MARTINEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMiguel Alberto MartinezDiane M. Lozano
Kirk Allan Morgan
James Michael Causey
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
Christyne Marie Martens
Caitlin Frances Harper
Katherine Anne Adams

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence
Opinion Number:2018 WY 147
Citation:432 P.3d 493

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/23/2018Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/23/2018Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/23/2018Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/28/2018Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion (redacted transcripts)RecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
03/29/2018Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/10/2018Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/11/2018Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and received Designation of RecordEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/25/2018Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/27/2018Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of designation of record.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/02/2018Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/06/2018Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from James Michael Causey o/b/o AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/10/2018Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/11/2018Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/11/2018Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/12/2018Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Katherine A. Adams obo AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/20/2018Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/20/2018Record - Transmitted record on appeal, seven volumes (Volumes 1 and 2 - Original Papers; Volumes 3 and 4 - Transcripts; Volume 5 - Confidential File; Volume 6 - Sealed File; Volume 7 - Exhibits)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/20/2018Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/15/2018Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, Chief Justice Davis, Justices Burke, Fox, Kautz and Boomgaarden (James M. Causey o/b/o Appellant; Katherine A. Adams o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/09/2018Notice of Reassignment Following Retirement (Justice Burke)OrderOtherFinal
12/31/2018Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with Justice Boomgaarden writing for the courtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/09/2019Correspondence - Incoming - Letter from Appellant. Referred to Appellant's counselCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
01/16/2019Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/16/2019Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/16/2019Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/16/2019Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/24/2019Service - Certified mail signature return card - record received 1/22/19ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal