Case: 02-00-00223-CR
02-00-00223-CR
06/15/2000
Aggravated Sexual Assault
Willard Lee Jackson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/06/2018 | Letter received | | |
12/04/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |
12/04/2001 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
11/26/2001 | Order Entered | | |
11/07/2001 | Petition for Review Disposed in Higher Court | Refused | |
08/24/2001 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
07/25/2001 | Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA | | |
06/21/2001 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/23/2001 | Submitted | | |
02/22/2001 | Submission | | |
02/22/2001 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/22/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
01/22/2001 | Brief Filed | | |
12/27/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/21/2000 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
11/20/2000 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
11/08/2000 | Letter | | |
10/31/2000 | Other Document Received | | |
10/30/2000 | Other Document Received | | |
10/19/2000 | Order Entered | | |
10/19/2000 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/16/2000 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |
10/03/2000 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/29/2000 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |
06/30/2000 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/29/2000 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |
06/29/2000 | Correspondence from interested entity | | |
06/28/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
06/27/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
06/15/2000 | Appellant's Notice of Appeal | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/04/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | John Brasher |
Unknown User | Criminal - State of Texas | Matthew W. Paul John Brasher |
Jackson, Willard Lee | Criminal - Appellant | John F. Curry |
Trial Court Information
89th District Court
Wichita
Honorable Juanita L. Pavlick, Judge, 89th District Court
36,609-C
Cts. 1-3: Life IDTDCJ for each count & $10,000 fine for each count