Case: 11-00-00142-CV
11-00-00142-CV
04/14/2000
Miscellaneous civil
Joseph, M.D., Philmore
Wilson, James
No
1st Court of Appeals
04/14/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
04/20/2007 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
12/31/2000 | Yearly opinion book | | |
08/29/2000 | Mandate issued | | |
06/09/2000 | Motion filing fee paid | | |
06/08/2000 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/08/2000 | Submission set in Eastland | | |
06/08/2000 | Submitted | | |
06/01/2000 | Motion fee requested | | |
06/01/2000 | Mot. - To dismiss appeal filed | | |
05/05/2000 | No reporter's record will be filed in case. | | |
05/03/2000 | Clerk and/or Reporter's Record filed | | |
04/14/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
04/14/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |
04/04/2000 | No Description Available. | | |
04/04/2000 | Notice of appeal filed | | |
02/04/2000 | No Description Available. | | |
01/07/2000 | No Description Available. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/29/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
James Wilson | Appellee | Theresa Lynn |
Wilson, James | Appellee | Sam M. Yates, Jr. |
Joseph, M.D., Philmore | Appellant | Robert M. Roach |
Joseph, M.D., Philmore | Appellant | Robert B. Dubose |
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Tony Lindsay, Judge
98-23878