judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1654
B-1654
07/11/1969
Application for Writ of Error
JOE BOWRN, JR
NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY, SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/16/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/15/1969Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/28/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
07/11/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1969Response to Motion filed
10/16/1969Response to Motion filed
10/16/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/15/1969Reply to Response
08/23/1969Miscellaneous letter
07/28/1969Response to Petition
07/17/1969Response to Petition
07/11/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/11/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Joe Bowrn, JrPetitioner
SELECT INSURANCE COMPANYRespondent
National Union Fire Insurance CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information