Case Heading (S-18-0082) | |||||
Case Number: | S-18-0082 | Case Docketed On: | 03/28/2018 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | ALAN LAYNE FARLEY v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | ALAN LAYNE FARLEY, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Alan Layne Farley | Pro Se |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael Christyne Marie Martens Caitlin Frances Harper |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Guilty plea |
Opinion Number: | 2018 WY 86 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/28/2018 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/28/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/28/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
03/30/2018 | Notice-Incoming - Amended index | Notice-Incoming | Amended index | Final | |
05/10/2018 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
05/10/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to file Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/11/2018 | Order - Grant - extension of time | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
05/25/2018 | Brief - Anders | Brief | Anders | Final | |
05/25/2018 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
05/25/2018 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
05/25/2018 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Pursuant to Anders v. California; Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro Se Brief; and Motion to Withdraw as Counsel | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
05/25/2018 | Record - Received unfiled record from Public Defender, four volumes. | Record | Received unfiled record | Final | |
05/25/2018 | Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Pro se Brief | Order | Grant Anders Extension pro se brief | Final | |
07/13/2018 | Failure to File - Brief of appellant - pro se after anders (not incarcerated) | Failure to File | Brief of appellant - pro se | Final | |
08/01/2018 | Published Order Affirming the District Court's Judgment and Sentence | Opinion | Published order | Final | |
08/17/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
08/17/2018 | Record - Returned unfiled record to the Clerk of the District Court, four volumes. | Record | Returned unfiled record | Final | |
08/17/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
08/17/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
08/22/2018 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - record signed for 8/20/2018 by Connie Rollins | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |