judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1670
B-1670
07/23/1969
Application for Writ of Error
LOLA B. LONG
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/30/1969Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/18/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
09/08/1969Amended PetitionPetitioner
08/14/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
07/23/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/05/1969Response to Motion filed
10/30/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/18/1969Response to Petition
09/08/1969Amended Petition
08/14/1969Response to Petition
07/23/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/23/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lola B. LongPetitioner
SOUTHWESTERN BELL TELEPHONE COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information